+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2015
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Environment
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 150B
- 150B-19.1
- 150B-21.26.
- 150B-21.3
- 150B-21.4
- 150B-21.9
+ − Votes (3)
August 5, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 7
August 5, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 7
April 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor