+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/2/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-48
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/28/2015
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 05/26/2015
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Judiciary II
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 15A
- 148
- 148-10.5
- 15A-301.1
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor