+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-83
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2016
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Transportation
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 44A
- 44A-50
- 44A-51
- 44A-51.1
- 44A-51.2
- 44A-51.3
- 44A-51.4
- 44A-51.5
- 44A-51.6
- 44A-55
- 65-69
- 65
+ − Votes (5)
June 23, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 17
June 22, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 7
June 22, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
April 29, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor