+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred On 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2013-215
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred On 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Ruled Material
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Government
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Government
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (6)
June 27, 2013: R3 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
June 26, 2013: M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 8
June 25, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 3
June 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
May 14, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4