+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/11/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-212
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 8/5/2015
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15A
- 15A-284.52
- 15A-284.53
+ − Votes (4)
August 3, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 12
July 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 30, 2015: A1 Pittman Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor