+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Commerce
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/20/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Commerce and Job Development
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
June 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor