+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (53)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-195
- Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2015
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Failed A14
- Amend Adopted A10
- Amendment Withdrawn A11
- Amend Adopted A13
- Amendment Withdrawn A12
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A15
- Amend Failed A16
- Amendment Withdrawn A17
- Amend Adopted A18
- Amend Tabled A19
- Ordered Engrossed
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A5
- Ordered Engrossed
- Amend Adopted A6
- Amend Adopted A7
- Amend Failed A8
- Amend Failed A9
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/16/2015
- Withdrawn From Com
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/08/2015
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Statutes Amended (45)
- 14 -
- 113 -
- 113-291.1 -
- 14-269 -
- 14-269.2 -
- 14-269.3 -
- 14-277.2 -
- 14-315 -
- 14-402 -
- 14-409.41 -
- 14-409.42 -
- 14-409.46 -
- 14-409.47 -
- 14-415.11 -
- 14-415.12 -
- 14-415.23 -
- 14-415.27 -
- 14-415.28 -
- 14-415.4 -
- 15A -
- 90 -
- 106 -
- 122C -
- 106-503.2 -
- 14-404 -
- 14-409.40 -
- 14-415.15 -
- 14-415.21 -
- 90-21.75 -
- 90-21.76 -
- 90-21.77 -
- 90-21.78 -
- 90-21.79 -
- 90-21.80 -
- 120-32.1 -
- 122C-54 -
- 122C-54.1 -
- 14-269.4 -
- 14-409.42. -
- 14-409.43 -
- 14-415.13 -
- 14-415.3 -
- 15A-502 -
- 15A-534 -
- 14-403 -
+ − Votes (20)
July 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
June 17, 2015: A13 Adams Third Reading
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 17, 2015: A14 Speciale Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 61
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 17, 2015: A15 Cunningham Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 74
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
June 17, 2015: A10 Lewis Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 17, 2015: A18 Turner, B. Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
June 17, 2015: A19 Glazier M3 To Lay On The Table Third Reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
June 17, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 5
June 17, 2015: A16 Fisher Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 79
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
June 16, 2015: A9 Ager Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2015: A1 Lewis Second Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 16, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2015: A2 Adams Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 16, 2015: A3 Cleveland Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 16, 2015: A5 McNeill Second Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 16, 2015: A4 Turner, R. Second Reading
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
June 16, 2015: A6 Daughtry M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2015: A6 Daughtry Second Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2015: A7 Pendleton Second Reading
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 51
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2015: A8 Luebke Second Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 73
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor