+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-97
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/11/2015
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/09/2015
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 14
- 14-34.6
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 5
June 3, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor