+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/3/2013
- Ch. SL 2013-234
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2013
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Commerce
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 02/28/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
June 19, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 19, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor