+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (61)
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Veto Received from House
On October 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-209
- Veto Overridden
On September 21, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Governor
- Vetoed 09/21/2017
On August 31, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 8/31/2017
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report Adopted
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/31/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
- Reptd Fav For Adoption
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
- Reptd Fav
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Environment
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (51)
- 143
- 143-215.31
- 113
- 113A
- 130
- 143B
- 113-300.6
- 113-300.7
- 113A-119
- 113A-124
- 130A-294
- 130A-309.17
- 130A-310.72
- 143-215.1
- 143-215.1C
- 143-215.3A
- 143-355
- 143B-279.11
- 143B-279.9
- 130A
- 105-275
- 113-182.1
- 130A-22
- 143B-289.52
- 143B-289.54
- 150B-19
- 150B-21.3
- 40A-3
- 74-50
- 74-51
- 74-52
- 74-54
- 74-54.1
- 74-55
- 74-58
- 74-60
- 74.55
- 40A
- 74
- 105
- 143-214.12
- 113B
- 113B-4
- 153A
- 159
- 130A-291
- 130A-335
- 130A-336.1
- 143-215.73M
- 153A-292
- 159-211
+ − Votes (9)
October 4, 2017: Motion 11 Veto Override
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
October 4, 2017: Veto Override
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
August 31, 2017: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 13
August 30, 2017: Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 11
June 28, 2017: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
June 27, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2017: A1 Yarborough Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3