+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 115C -
- 115C-64.25 -
- 115C-64.26 -
- 115C-64.27 -
- 126-5 -
- 120-19 -
- 120-19.1 -
- 120-19.4 -
- 120-3.1 -
- 120-32.02 -
+ − Vote
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor