+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-402
- Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013
On July 29, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/29/2013
On July 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Rec To Concur In S Amend 1
- Rec From Senate
On July 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On July 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/09/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 153A -
- 153A-303.1 -
+ − Votes (6)
July 25, 2013: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
July 25, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
July 24, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
July 24, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
May 13, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
May 9, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor