+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/11/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-72
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/3/2015
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 05/26/2015
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Finance
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 14
- 14-127.1
- 14-132
+ − Votes (6)
June 1, 2015: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 8
May 27, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 27, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
May 26, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 1
April 15, 2015: A1 Reives Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 3
April 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor