+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2018-110
On June 26, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2018
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Judiciary I Stricken
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Judiciary I
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- C-I-37 -
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
June 25, 2018: Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
April 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 5
April 27, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor