+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
- Reptd Fav
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
+ − Vote
April 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3