+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-140
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
- Ratified
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 90
- 90-171.80
- 90-171.94
- 90-171.95
- 90-171.95A
- 90-171.95B
- 90-171.95C
- 90-171.95D
- 90-171.95E
- 90-171.95F
- 90-171.95G
- 90-171.95H
- 90-171.95I
- 90-171.95J
+ − Votes (2)
June 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor