+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-34
- Ratified
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 160A-288.2A
+ − Vote
March 8, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2