+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rules Suspended
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (208)
- 1 -
- 63 -
- 113A -
- 130A -
- 143 -
- 153A -
- 160A -
- 160D -
- 1-54 -
- 1-54.1 -
- 113A-208 -
- 113A-211 -
- 130A-55 -
- 143-214.5 -
- 143-215.57 -
- 143-215.58 -
- 153A-102.1 -
- 153A-143 -
- 153A-144 -
- 153A-452 -
- 153A-455 -
- 153A-457 -
- 153A-458 -
- 160-1-2 -
- 160-10-10 -
- 160A-12-2 -
- 160A-181.1 -
- 160A-199 -
- 160A-201 -
- 160A-4.1 -
- 160D-1-1 -
- 160D-1-10 -
- 160D-1-11 -
- 160D-1-12 -
- 160D-1-13 -
- 160D-1-14 -
- 160D-1-3 -
- 160D-1-4 -
- 160D-1-5 -
- 160D-1-6 -
- 160D-1-7 -
- 160D-1-8 -
- 160D-1-9 -
- 160D-10-1 -
- 160D-10-11 -
- 160D-10-12 -
- 160D-10-2 -
- 160D-10-3 -
- 160D-10-4 -
- 160D-10-5 -
- 160D-10-6 -
- 160D-10-7 -
- 160D-10-8 -
- 160D-10-9 -
- 160D-11-1 -
- 160D-11-10 -
- 160D-11-11 -
- 160D-11-13 -
- 160D-11-14 -
- 160D-11-15 -
- 160D-11-16 -
- 160D-11-17 -
- 160D-11-18 -
- 160D-11-19 -
- 160D-11-2 -
- 160D-11-20 -
- 160D-11-21 -
- 160D-11-22 -
- 160D-11-23 -
- 160D-11-24 -
- 160D-11-25 -
- 160D-11-26 -
- 160D-11-27 -
- 160D-11-3 -
- 160D-11-4 -
- 160D-11-5 -
- 160D-11-6 -
- 160D-11-7 -
- 160D-11-8 -
- 160D-11-9 -
- 160D-12-1 -
- 160D-12-10 -
- 160D-12-11 -
- 160D-12-12 -
- 160D-12-3 -
- 160D-12-4 -
- 160D-12-5 -
- 160D-12-6 -
- 160D-12-8 -
- 160D-12-9 -
- 160D-13-1 -
- 160D-13-11 -
- 160D-13-12 -
- 160D-13-13 -
- 160D-13-14 -
- 160D-13-15 -
- 160D-13-16 -
- 160D-13-2 -
- 160D-13-20 -
- 160D-13-3 -
- 160D-13-4 -
- 160D-13-5 -
- 160D-13-6 -
- 160D-13-7 -
- 160D-14-1 -
- 160D-14-2 -
- 160D-14-3 -
- 160D-14-4 -
- 160D-14-5 -
- 160D-2-1 -
- 160D-2-2 -
- 160D-2-3 -
- 160D-2-4 -
- 160D-3-1 -
- 160D-3-2 -
- 160D-3-3 -
- 160D-3-4 -
- 160D-3-5 -
- 160D-3-6 -
- 160D-3-7 -
- 160D-3-8 -
- 160D-3-9 -
- 160D-4-1 -
- 160D-4-2 -
- 160D-4-3 -
- 160D-4-4 -
- 160D-4-5 -
- 160D-4-6 -
- 160D-5-1 -
- 160D-5-2 -
- 160D-5-3 -
- 160D-6-1 -
- 160D-6-2 -
- 160D-6-3 -
- 160D-6-4 -
- 160D-6-5 -
- 160D-7-1 -
- 160D-7-2 -
- 160D-7-3 -
- 160D-7-4 -
- 160D-7-5 -
- 160D-7-6 -
- 160D-7-7 -
- 160D-8-1 -
- 160D-8-2 -
- 160D-8-3 -
- 160D-8-4 -
- 160D-8-5 -
- 160D-8-6 -
- 160D-8-7 -
- 160D-8-8 -
- 160D-9-1 -
- 160D-9-10 -
- 160D-9-11 -
- 160D-9-12 -
- 160D-9-13 -
- 160D-9-14 -
- 160D-9-2 -
- 160D-9-20 -
- 160D-9-21 -
- 160D-9-22 -
- 160D-9-23 -
- 160D-9-24 -
- 160D-9-3 -
- 160D-9-30 -
- 160D-9-31 -
- 160D-9-32 -
- 160D-9-33 -
- 160D-9-34 -
- 160D-9-4 -
- 160D-9-40 -
- 160D-9-41 -
- 160D-9-42 -
- 160D-9-43 -
- 160D-9-44 -
- 160D-9-45 -
- 160D-9-46 -
- 160D-9-47 -
- 160D-9-48 -
- 160D-9-49 -
- 160D-9-5 -
- 160D-9-50 -
- 160D-9-51 -
- 160D-9-6 -
- 160D-9-60 -
- 160D-9-61 -
- 160D-9-62 -
- 160D-9-63 -
- 160D-9-7 -
- 160D-9-8 -
- 160D-9-9 -
- 63-31 -
- 63-32 -
- 63-33 -
- 63-34 -
- 63-35 -
- 120-19 -
- 120-19.1 -
- 120-19.4 -
- 120-3.1 -
- 142-15.4 -
- 142-96 -
- 143-239 -
- 143C-4-2 -
- 40A-3 -
- 40A -
- 142 -
- 143C -
+ − Votes (6)
June 30, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
June 30, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 3
June 29, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 16
April 30, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2015: A1 Bryan Third Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 6
April 30, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6