+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/23/2015
- Signed by Gov. 7/23/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-166
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Placed On Cal For 07/14/2015
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Local Government
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 130A
- 130A-498
- 153A
- 153A-122
+ − Votes (3)
July 21, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
July 14, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3