+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-269
- Signed by Gov. 10/2/2015
On September 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/22/2015
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/16/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (4)
September 17, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
April 16, 2015: M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Oper. House Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
April 16, 2015: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 16
April 16, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor