+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 2, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 9/2/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-137
On August 31, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 8/31/2021
On August 26, 2021 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 08/31/2021
On August 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On August 25, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On August 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On August 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On August 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On August 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
August 31, 2021: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 15
August 24, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor