+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2017
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 120