+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2019: Third Reading
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 20