+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016
- Ch. SL 2016-75
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2016
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Finance
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20
- 20-7
+ − Votes (3)
June 28, 2016: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
June 27, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 23, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor