+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/22/2021
- Ch. SL 2021-94
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/20/2021
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/11/2021
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
July 15, 2021: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 13
July 13, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor