+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Insurance
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Insurance
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 58
- 58-36-10
- 58-36-15
+ − Vote
May 14, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor