+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/23/2017
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105
- 105-164.13
+ − Vote
May 23, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor