+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-244
- Ratified
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Elections
- Reptd Fav
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Elections
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
September 17, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor