+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 20, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-137
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
- Ratified
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Com Appointed
- Fail Concur In S Amend SA1
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Reptd Fav
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 136
- 136-19.4A
- 136-19.6
- 20
- 20-280
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2017: M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
June 29, 2017: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9
June 29, 2017: Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
June 28, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor