+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On June 26, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-100
- Became Law W/o Signature
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Added to Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/14/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2018
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Engrossed
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (23)
- 18B
- 105
- 105-113.68
- 18B-1001
- 18B-1104
- 18B-1116
- 18B-1120
- 18B-1121
- 18B-1305
- 18B-1309
- 18B-306
- 14
- 14-309.15
- 14-309.6
- 18B-1000
- 18B-1002
- 18B-1114.1
- 18B-1114.5
- 18B-1114.7
- 18B-1119
- 18B-1307
- 18B-308
- 18B-903A
+ − Votes (4)
June 15, 2018: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 13
June 14, 2018: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 26
April 26, 2017: A1 Hurley Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 84
- Present/NV: 1
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 25
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor