+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-4
- Signed by Gov. 3/6/2013
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 2/28/2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Placed On Cal For 02/26/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 02/27/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed On Cal For 01/31/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Ref To Com On Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
February 21, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
February 21, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
January 31, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor