+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/17/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2015: A1 Torbett Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
March 17, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor