+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Failed A4
- Amend Failed A5
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (6)
May 15, 2013: A1 Wilkins Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: A2 Szoka Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 76
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: A3 Collins Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: A4 Goodman Second Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: A5 Fulghum Second Reading
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 93
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor