+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred On 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2015-140
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred On 2nd Reading
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ruled Material
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2015
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/09/2015
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (6)
July 2, 2015: M11 Concur R3 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 14
July 1, 2015: M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
June 30, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
June 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 10, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
June 9, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor