+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2015-159
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 153A-274.
+ − Vote
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor