+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 14
- 14-16.6
- 14-16.7
- 14-288.9
- 14-33
- 14-34.11
- 14-34.2
- 14-34.6
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: A1 Rogers Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor