+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 42
- 42-45
+ − Votes (2)
April 27, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor