+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 21, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-155
- Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
- Reptd Fav
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Education - Community Colleges
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 116 -
- 116-209.54 -
- 115D-5 -
- 116-11 -
- 116-143.3A -
- 115D -
+ − Votes (5)
June 28, 2017: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
June 27, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 27, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor