+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-51
- Signed by Gov. 5/17/2013
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 5/16/2013
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Finance Stricken
- Sequential Referral To Commerce Stricken
- Sequential Referral To Finance Added
- Sequential Referral To Commerce Added
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 3
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/01/2013
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Public Utilities and Energy
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Public Utilities and Energy Added
- Serial Referral To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Energy and Emerging Markets Stricken
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Energy and Emerging Markets
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 143 -
- 143-215.115 -
- 143-215.116 -
- 143-215.117 -
- 143-215.118 -
- 143-215.119 -
- 143-215.120 -
- 143-215.121 -
- 143-215.122 -
- 143-215.123 -
- 143-215.124 -
- 143-215.125 -
- 143-215.126 -
- 62-2 -
+ − Votes (5)
May 15, 2013: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
May 14, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 1, 2013: A1 Whitmire Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 1, 2013: A2 Tine Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
May 1, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor