+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/15/2013
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Vote
April 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor