+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 17, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office
On August 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On August 12, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/12/2015
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/10/2015
- Withdrawn From Com
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Added
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (41)
- 95 -
- 97 -
- 153A -
- 160A -
- 153A-134 -
- 160A-194 -
- 95-25.15 -
- 95-275 -
- 95-276 -
- 95-277 -
- 95-278 -
- 95-279 -
- 95-280 -
- 95-281 -
- 95-282 -
- 95-283 -
- 97-2 -
- 97-5.1 -
- 87 -
- 143 -
- 143-59.2 -
- 143-760 -
- 143-761 -
- 143-762 -
- 143-763 -
- 143-764 -
- 143-765 -
- 143-766 -
- 143-767 -
- 143-768 -
- 153A-360 -
- 160A-420 -
- 87-11 -
- 87-23 -
- 87-42 -
- 87-47 -
- 105-259 -
- 96 -
- 105 -
- 150B-19.1 -
- 96-1 -
+ − Votes (5)
September 17, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 3
September 17, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
August 13, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 10
August 12, 2015: A1 Hager Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
August 12, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6