+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-82
- Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/7/2013
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 143 -
- 113A-68 -
- 143-214.7 -
- 143-214.7B -
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
May 14, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor