+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Amend Failed A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2019: A1 Hawkins Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 64
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
May 2, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor