+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Commerce
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3