+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013
- Ch. SL 2013-305
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2013
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Finance
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Banking
- Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 115D
- 147
- 159
- 115D-58.6
- 147-69.1
- 159-30
+ − Votes (2)
July 9, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
April 22, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4