+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 26, 2019 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2019-172
- Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2019
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/11/2019
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/02/2019
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2019
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2019
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
July 11, 2019: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
July 10, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4