+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-261
- Ratified
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in Senate Clerk's Office
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/16/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 120-30.9F -
- 120-30.9I. -
+ − Votes (3)
July 3, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
July 3, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
April 16, 2013: A1 Faircloth Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7