+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, State and Local Government II
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
April 24, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor