+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee C
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2013: A1 McNeill Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor