+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-62
- Signed by Gov. 6/5/2015
- Pres. To Gov. 6/5/2015
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/03/2015
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A11
- Amend Adopted A10
- Amend Tabled A9
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Failed A4
- Divide Quest. FAILS
- Amend Failed A1
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Failed A5
- Amendment Withdrawn A7
- Amendment Withdrawn A8
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Tabled A6
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Failed A2
- Amend Failed A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Serial Referral To Judiciary IV Stricken
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Judiciary IV
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Statutes Amended (32)
+ − Votes (16)
June 3, 2015: Motion 12 - To Divide the Bill on Concurence
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 68
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
June 3, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
June 1, 2015: Amendment 10
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
June 1, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 2
June 1, 2015: Amendment 11
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 1, 2015: Amendment 9 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 4
May 28, 2015: Amendment 4
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2015: Motion 11 Divide Question
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2015: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2015: Amendment 5
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 3
May 28, 2015: Amendment 6 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
April 23, 2015: A1 Fisher Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 69
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 23, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 1
April 23, 2015: A2 Fisher Second Reading
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor